Mahawar takes over as ONGC director
Ved Prakash Mahawar on Saturday took over as Director (Onshore) of state-owned Oil and Natural Gas Corp (ONGC).
Aug 01, 2015, 19:05 PM ISTOil Min reinstates Shashi Shankar as ONGC Director
The Oil Ministry has reinstated Shashi Shankar as Director (Technology and Field Services) of Oil and Natural Gas Corp (ONGC) pending an inquiry into alleged irregularities in an unawarded Rs 23 crore tender of 2011.
Jul 16, 2015, 15:17 PM ISTA K Srinivasan to be next ONGC Finance Director
Srinivasan will be appointed Director (Finance), ONGC, subject to approval of ACC headed by Prime Minister Narendra Modi.
Oct 15, 2014, 13:48 PM ISTGovt removes 3 independent directors from ONGC board
The government has removed three independent directors appointed by the previous UPA regime from the board of Oil and Natural Gas Corp (ONGC).
Sep 22, 2014, 16:56 PM ISTMisra takes over as HR director at ONGC
Misra, 56, replaced K S Jamestin, who superannuated yesterday.
Aug 01, 2014, 16:12 PM IST